+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 78 Nays 31
- Read a third time
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/30/2013
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joe Haveman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor