+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 136 Yeas 101 Nays 7
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/26/2017
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rob VerHeulen
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor