+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted and amended
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 134 Yeas 94 Nays 14
- Transmitted
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/26/2017
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dave Pagel
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor