+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 89'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2013 @ 3:51 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/28/2013 @ 10:06 AM
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/17/2013 @ 1:37 PM
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 250 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/23/2013
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jeff Farrington
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor