+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 1, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned PA 134'15 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 9/30/2015 @ 2:48 PM
- Approved by the Governor 9/30/2015 @ 9:54 AM
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 9/24/2015 @ 1:41 PM
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 305 Yeas 86 Nays 18
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 358 yeas 34 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 1
- Amendment(s) adopted
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 101 Nays 9
- Read a third time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/28/2015
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor