+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 191'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/7/2017 @ 2:22 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/7/2017 @ 11:20 AM
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/1/2017 @ 12:55 PM
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On November 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 464 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On November 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 103 Yeas 104 Nays 3
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/24/2017
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dave Pagel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor