+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned PA 38'13 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/4/2013 @ 11:00 AM
- Approved by the Governor 6/4/2013 @ 9:40 AM
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/23/2013 @ 10:22 AM
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 200 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 24 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/23/2013
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kenneth Kurtz
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor