+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Commerce and Tourism
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/16/2019
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Tourism
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Larry Inman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor