+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On October 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on local government
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 478 Yeas 88 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 8
- Transmitted
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/15/2019
- Referred to Committee on Local Government and Municipal Finance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Jim Ellison
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor