+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 31, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned PA 165'19
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/20/2019 12:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 12/20/2019 12:20 PM
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/13/2019 03:29 PM
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 364 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On November 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported favorably without amendment
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 78 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2019
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tommy Brann
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor