+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/26/2021
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced by Representative Thomas Albert
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
- Read a third time
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Read a second time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor