+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on government operations
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 13 Yeas 84 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
- Read a third time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2019
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Michele Hoitenga
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor