+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 240'14 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:58 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/17/2014 @ 9:40 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/27/2014 @ 2:07 PM
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 428 Yeas 109 Nays 1
- Senate substitute S-3 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-3 with immediate effect
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 455 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 8 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/10/2013
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative John Walsh
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor