+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned pa 0089'16 with immediate effect
- Filed with secretary of state 4/26/2016 @ 1:04 pm
- Approved by governor 4/26/2016 @ 9:46 am
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Presented to governor 4/18/2016 @ 3:30 pm
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Given immediate effect
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 153 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Received on 12/09/2015
On December 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 569 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3 as amended
- Substitute s-3 as amended concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3 and amendment(s)
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-3
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-3
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
- Introduced by senator steven bieda