+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ225ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
On February 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 19, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Amendments by Sen. Waddell agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 971701749-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amds. 971701749-ES1
- Printed as engrossed 971701749-ES1
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Communicated to House
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 971701749-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 978227749
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: Reported from Rules with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor