+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On June 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
- Substituted for SCR76 (1R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1)
On June 18, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 25, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR SCR76
- Present/NV: 40
June 21, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2012: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor