+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On August 31, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary