+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2313
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On September 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on The Judiciary
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security