+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied H1424
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in A1
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:30 PM in 437
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor