+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 435 of the Acts of 2018
On December 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H750
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor