+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor