+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 11, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor