+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 79 of the Acts of 2017
On August 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 28, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor