+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2499
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to the committee on The Judiciary
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on The Judiciary
On July 11, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor