+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday October 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On August 7, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/12/2020 from 04:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On July 9, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
- Rules suspended
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor