+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2953
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On September 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 30, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
On April 21, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
- Rules suspended
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor