+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2535
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor