+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On October 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2016
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 20, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 20, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On October 6, 2016 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
On September 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On August 25, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
- Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act establishing a sick leave bank
for Donna Paul, an employee of the Department of Corrections
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor