+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2018
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
- Rules suspended
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently