+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On October 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 290 of the Acts of 2016
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 6, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On September 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On August 11, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
- Rules suspended
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor