+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4784
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On November 30, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor