+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2341
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2341
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2018 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
- Rules suspended
On December 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently