+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied S2037
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
- Rules suspended
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor