+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2019
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 6, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On October 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On August 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
- Rules suspended
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently