+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor