+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported adversely by committee
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation