+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Report amended by substitution of bill
- Rules suspended
- Ought NOT to pass (under JR10)
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor