+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On September 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 280 of the Acts of 2016
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On September 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On September 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
- Rules suspended
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor