+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2017
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B1
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service