+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
On April 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor