+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a study order, see S2543
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor