+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Public Health
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor