+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in 428
On August 12, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Public Health
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor