+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
On September 3, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Education