+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 1, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor