+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday April 6, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 19, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development