+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor