+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Elder Affairs
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health