+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor