+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
- Accompanied by H2210
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the committee on Health Care Financing